VA HB2201 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with letter (12-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with letter (12-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State Forester; confidentiality of certain records. Excludes from the mandatory disclosure provisions of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act certain records of the Department of Forestry (the Department). The records include trade secrets and financial information, reports of criminal violations made to the Department by persons outside the Department, and records of an active administrative investigation.
Title
State Forester; confidentiality of certain records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with letter (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with letter (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 19101880D-E |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2201E |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101880D |