VA HB220 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1155)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1155)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; postage prepaid on return envelope. Requires the envelope provided to an absentee voter for the return of the absentee ballot to include prepaid postage. The provisions of the bill do not become effective unless reenacted by the 2021 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Absentee voting; postage prepaid on return envelope.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (24-Y 13-N) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree to (58-Y 33-N) (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (5-Y 92-N) (Y: 5 N: 92 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 38-N) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree to (58-Y 33-N) (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (5-Y 92-N) (Y: 5 N: 92 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 38-N) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1155) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1155 (effective - see bill) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB220ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (24-Y 13-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Agree to (58-Y 33-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (58-Y 33-N) |
2020-03-04 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senators: Spruill, Surovell, Vogel |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Delegates: Krizek, Helmer, Kilgore |
2020-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (5-Y 92-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (5-Y 92-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (25-Y 15-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (11-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (60-Y 38-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (60-Y 38-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (17-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100609D |