VA HB2195 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-17 - Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-17 - Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance holding companies. Revises the requirements applicable to insurance holding companies to conform to the National Association of Insurance Commissioners Insurance Holding Company System Regulatory Act and Insurance Holding Company System Model Regulation. The measure expands insurance regulators' examination authority to include all entities within the insurance holding company system to ascertain the financial condition of the insurer. The State Corporation Commission will be authorized to use supervisory colleges, which will be used by regulators (i) to coordinate supervision of an insurance holding company system that has national and international operations and (ii) to assess the company's business strategy, financial position, legal and regulatory position, risk exposure, risk management, and governance processes. The measure also makes dental and optometric services plans subject to the insurance holding companies provisions. The holding companies requirements in effect on June 30, 2013, will continue to apply to any insurance holding company transaction commenced prior to January 1, 2014, unless otherwise provided.
Title
Insurance holding companies; applicability to certain plans.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-17 | House | Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2013-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13101061D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1327 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1329 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1331 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1332.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1333 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1334.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1334.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1334.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1334.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2195 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2195+hil |