VA HB2193 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0121)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0121)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Podiatry; expands definition. Expands the definition of podiatry to include the diagnosis and treatment of lower extremity ulcers, provided that the treatment of severe lower extremity ulcers proximal to the foot and ankle only be performed by appropriately trained, credentialed podiatrists in an approved hospital or ambulatory surgery center at which the podiatrist has privileges.
Title
Podiatry; expands definition.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0121) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 121 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2193ER) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-28 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House (94-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Printed as engrossed 11102591D-E | |
2011-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB2193E | |
2011-01-27 | House: Amendment by Delegate Ebbin agreed to | |
2011-01-27 | House: Committee amendment #1 rejected | |
2011-01-27 | House: Committee amendments #2 and #3 agreed to | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-25 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102591D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1396 (Same As) 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)