VA HB2186 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer of property by VDOT. Authorizes VDOT to exchange real property controlled by the Department in Albemarle County for private property owned by the Wachtmeister 1981 Revocable Trust in exchange for land adjoining the Keene Area Headquarters for installation of a septic drain field for the Headquarters.
Title
Real property; authorizes VDOT to convey certain property controlled by Department in Albemarle Co.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 238 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2186ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 13105174D-S1 (92-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2186S1 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13105174D-S1 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13105174D-S1 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-15 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13101419D |