VA HB2182 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral Health Commission; process to solicit and receive input. Provides that the Behavioral Health Commission shall have the power and duty to implement a process to solicit and receive input from (i) individuals who are currently receiving or have received behavioral health services or (ii) individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities or autism spectrum disorders or the family members of such individuals to inform the work of the Commission. Behavioral Health Commission; process to solicit and receive input. Provides that the Behavioral Health Commission shall have the power and duty to implement a process to solicit and receive input from (i) individuals who are currently receiving or have received behavioral health services or (ii) individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities or autism spectrum disorders or the family members of such individuals to inform the work of the Commission.
Title
Behavioral Health Commission; powers and duties, process to solicit and receive input.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481) | |
2023-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 481 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2182ER) |
2023-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2182H1 |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105897D-H1 |
2023-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105897D-H1 |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103619D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly