VA HB2182 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control. Eliminates the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board and replaces it with the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority, created by the bill. The bill provides for the appointment of the board of directors of the Authority and the appointment by the board of directors of a chief executive officer of the Authority, and sets eligibility requirements for appointment, including background checks. Among other things, the bill also (i) provides for the transfer of current ABC employees to the Authority, (ii) continues such employees' participation in the state health plan and VRS, and (iii) sets out the powers and duties of the Authority and the chief executive officer. The bill contains numerous technical amendments. The measure becomes effective on July 1, 2012.
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority; created, replaces Alcoholic Beverage Control Board.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101482D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act
Authorities
General Provisions of Virginia Code
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act
Authorities
General Provisions of Virginia Code
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2288.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 246.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 371.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2336 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2349 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2696 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2818 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4024 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4345 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 509.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 1010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 357 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 252 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 103.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 128 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 209.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 212.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3651 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 148.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 402.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2182 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2182+hil |