VA HB2177 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Critical National Security Language Grant Fund and Program established. Establishes the Critical National Security Language Grant Fund and Program within the Department of Education for the purpose of awarding grants on a competitive basis to any school division that provides one or more foreign language courses in a foreign language that is currently identified as critical by the National Security Language Initiative for Youth scholarship program. The bill provides that such grants are limited to an annual amount sufficient to provide one or more full-time equivalent teaching positions to provide one or more critical foreign language courses.
Title
Critical National Security Language Grant Fund and Program; established.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] |
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-30 | House | Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102331D |