VA HB2175 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2175
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Housing Bill of Rights; housing protections; foreclosures; manufactured housing. Provides for various protections for homeowners and tenants of manufactured home parks, including (i) restricting the circumstances under which a court may order a person's primary residence to be sold to enforce a judgment lien; (ii) requiring localities to incorporate into their comprehensive plans strategies to promote manufactured housing as a source of affordable housing; (iii) requiring the Director of Housing and Community Development to develop a statement of tenant rights and responsibilities explaining in plain language the rights and responsibilities of tenants under the Virginia Manufactured Home Lot Rental Act; (iv) prohibiting a trustee from selling a property in a foreclosure sale without receiving an affidavit signed by the party that provided the notice confirming the notice was sent to the owner, with a copy of such notice attached to the affidavit; (v) increasing the notice period for a foreclosure sale from 14 to 60 days and requiring such notice to provide the grantor with information regarding housing counseling; and (vi) requiring the landlord of a manufactured home park to provide tenants who own their manufactured home information about housing assistance and legal aid organizations. The bill also requires the Department of Housing and Community Development to convene a stakeholder group to assist in the development of the statement of tenant rights and responsibilities. The provisions of the bill related to the specifics of the notice that is required before a trustee can sell a property in a foreclosure sale has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2021. Housing Bill of Rights; housing protections; foreclosures; manufactured housing. Provides for various protections for homeowners and tenants of manufactured home parks, including (i) restricting the circumstances under which a court may order a person's primary residence to be sold to enforce a judgment lien; (ii) requiring localities to incorporate into their comprehensive plans strategies to promote manufactured housing as a source of affordable housing; (iii) requiring the Director of Housing and Community Development to develop a statement of tenant rights and responsibilities explaining in plain language the rights and responsibilities of tenants under the Virginia Manufactured Home Lot Rental Act; (iv) prohibiting a trustee from selling a property in a foreclosure sale without receiving an affidavit signed by the party that provided the notice confirming the notice was sent to the owner, with a copy of such notice attached to the affidavit; (v) increasing the notice period for a foreclosure sale from 14 to 60 days and requiring such notice to provide the grantor with information regarding housing counseling; and (vi) requiring the landlord of a manufactured home park to provide tenants who own their manufactured home information about housing assistance and legal aid organizations. The bill also requires the Department of Housing and Community Development to convene a stakeholder group to assist in the development of the statement of tenant rights and responsibilities. The provisions of the bill related to the specifics of the notice that is required before a trustee can sell a property in a foreclosure sale has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2021.
Title
Homeowners and tenants of manufactured home parks; housing protections, foreclosures, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 40-N) (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 40-N) (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (60-Y 40-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (60-Y 40-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2175H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103247D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103247D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102390D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2175 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2223.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 321 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 462 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |