VA HB2175 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health; dental and oral health programs for children. Provides that the mission of the State Board of Health and the Department of Health shall include provision of a comprehensive program of dental and oral health services for children.
Title
Health, Department of; dental and oral health programs for children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health and Human Resources | |
2011-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-20 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102678D |