VA HB2174 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers. Provides that if a motor vehicle manufacturer or factory branch discontinues, sells, or transfers its right to manufacture a line-make of motor vehicles, and the acquiring manufacturer or factory branch does not honor an existing franchise agreement with motor vehicle dealers in Virginia, such discontinuation, sale, or transfer shall constitute a termination of the franchise and such motor vehicle dealers shall be entitled to compensation pursuant to Virginia law. The bill provides that a manufacturer or distributor's right to first refusal in the event of a proposed sale or transfer of a dealership does not apply if such sale or transfer is not to a dealer licensed anywhere in the United States as a dealer holding a franchise from any manufacturer or to a distributor licensed as a manufacturer or distributor in the Commonwealth unless the exercise of such right of first refusal by a manufacturer or distributor with a program promoting minority dealers would lead to a minority dealer having a majority ownership of a dealership. The bill exempts certain manufacturers and distributors from the limitations on the right of first refusal.
Title
Motor vehicle dealers; manufacturers and factory branch transfers, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 738 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2174ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendments by Senator McPike agreed to |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (11-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2174H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105473D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105473D-H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101456D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1569.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1570 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |