VA HB2169 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Solicitation of prostitution; reorganization. Reorganizes the statute penalizing prostitution into two distinct sections. The penalties for all offenses remain unchanged. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Prostitution; reorganizes the statute penalizing into two distinct sections.
Sponsors
Del. Candi Mundon King [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101895D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2169 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 69.48:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 69.55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 346 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 346.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 346.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 357.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 10.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 215.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 268.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 58 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 42.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 116.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |