VA HB2169 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Continuing education for prescribers; substance abuse, addiction, and related pain management and prescribing practices. Requires the Board of Dentistry, Board of Medicine, and Board of Optometry to require continuing education on the topics of substance abuse, addiction, and related pain management and prescribing practices for licensed practitioners who are authorized to prescribe controlled substances.
Title
Continuing education for prescriber; completion of certain coursework for renewal, etc., of license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #4 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102698D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2912.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2169 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2169+hil |