VA HB2166 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Possession of controlled substances. Lists possession of certain controlled substances (buprenorphine, cocaine, codeine, fentanyl, heroin, hydrocodone, hydromorphone, methadone, methamphetamine; methylphenidate, morphine, and oxycodone) as separate offenses under the existing crime of possession of controlled substances for the purpose of having the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission promulgate separate Virginia crime codes for such offenses. The bill does not alter the existing penalty for possession of these substances.
Title
Controlled substances; possession, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102039D |