VA HB2166 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Reporting of medical aid or treatment for drug overdoses. Requires a physician or other person who renders any medical aid or treatment to any person for an overdose that he knows or has reason to believe is an overdose of a controlled substance classified in Schedule I or II of the Drug Control Act to report such aid or treatment and the patient's name and address, if known, to local law enforcement.
Title
Reporting of medical aid or treatment for drug overdoses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1647-Miller) by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100494D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2166 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2166+hil |