VA HB2166 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance; candidate campaign committees; investments. Authorizes the investment of campaign committee funds subject to the prudent investment standards applicable to Virginia Retirement System investments.
Title
Campaign finance; investment of campaign committee funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13100656D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2166 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2166+hil |