VA HB2155 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Publication of information contained in local payment warrants. Authorizes local governments to publish aggregated information relating to warrants paid by the locality.
Title
Warrants; authorizes local governments to regularly publish information relating thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 485 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2155ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-25 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Conference substitute printed 11105631D-H1 | |
2011-02-24 | House: Delegates: Cline, Peace, Keam | |
2011-02-24 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senators: Reynolds, Petersen, Miller, Y.B. | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House: House acceded to request | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House 11105392D-S1 (1-Y 96-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2155S1 | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105392D-S1 | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105392D-S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103013D |