VA HB2152 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Retirement System; health insurance credits for retired state employees. Increases annually the amount of the health insurance credit for retirees who rendered at least 30 years of creditable service in the Virginia Retirement System. The bill increases the credit by the same percentage as any annual post-retirement supplement that is calculated for employees hired on or after July 1, 2010.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Retirement System; health insurance credits for retired state employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Appropriations
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103665D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5111400(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback