VA HB2146 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Land development; conservation or replacement of trees; local option. Authorizes any locality to adopt an ordinance providing for either the conservation of or the planting and replacement of trees during the land development process. Currently, only a locality within Planning District 8 with a population density of 75 persons per square mile and which is classified as an eight-hour nonattainment area for ozone under the federal Clean Air Act and Amendments of 1990, in effect as of July 1, 2008, may adopt such an ordinance for the conservation of trees and only a locality with a population density of 75 persons per square mile or within the Chesapeake Bay watershed may adopt such an ordinance for the planting and replacement of trees during the land development process.
Title
Land development; conservation or replacement of trees, local option.
Sponsors
Del. Cheryl Turpin [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101980D |