VA HB2142 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - (66 affirmative votes required to override veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

School protection officers; minimum training standards; exemption. Defines a school protection officer as a retired law-enforcement officer hired on a part-time basis by the local law-enforcement agency to provide limited law-enforcement and security

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School protection officers; definition, compulsory minimum training standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 45-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03House(66 affirmative votes required to override veto)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (50-Y 49-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto (50-Y 49-N)
2019-03-26 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2142ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate (26-Y 13-N)
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N)
2019-02-07SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2019-02-07SenateRereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 45-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House (53-Y 45-N)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2142H1
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105664D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105664D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 7-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 1-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103242D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91101(n/a)See Bill Text
91113(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2142
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2142+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2142H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2142ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1502V0015+HB2142
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0009+HB2142
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2097+HB2142
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0178+HB2142
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0280+HB2142
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0538HB2142+HB2142
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0586HB2142+HB2142
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3427+HB2142

Bill Comments

feedback