VA HB2142 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Farm wineries. Provides that a locality may not regulate the number or frequency of usual and customary activities and events at farm wineries. The bill also states that regular business hours shall, at a minimum, include the hours between 9:00 a.m. and 9:00 p.m.
Title
Farm wineries; locality may not regulate activities.
Sponsors
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] | Del. Scott Garrett [R] | Del. James LeMunyon [R] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. David Ramadan [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (11-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #2 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102827D |