VA HB2141 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0828)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Local services districts; broadband and telecommunications services. Authorizes a local governing body, with respect to a service district, to contract with a nongovernmental broadband service provider who will construct, maintain, and own communications facilities and equipment required to facilitate delivery of last-mile broadband services to unserved areas of the service district, provided that the locality documents that less than 10 percent of residential and commercial units within the project area are capable of receiving broadband service at the time the construction project is approved by the locality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local service districts; broadband and telecommunications services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Motion for (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0828)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 828 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2141ER2)
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-18HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2141ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference substitute printed 19107566D-H2
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Stanley, Carrico, Favola
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Thomas, Byron, Krizek
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-20SenateMotion for (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 98-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-15SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-15SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2141H1
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105598D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105598D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103237D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522403(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2141
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2141+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2141H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2141H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2141ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2141ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0828+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0702V0010+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0019+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2074+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0078+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2141+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0717HB2141+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3053+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0850HB2141+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0853HB2141+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0854HB2141+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3278+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1017HB2141+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3382+HB2141
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1168HB2141+HB2141

Bill Comments

feedback