VA HB2133 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2133
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Issuance of writ of vacatur for victims of commercial sex trafficking. Establishes a procedure for victims of sex trafficking to file a petition of vacatur in circuit court to have certain convictions vacated and the police and court records expunged for such convictions. The bill requires the court to grant the writ and vacate a qualifying offense if it finds the petitioner (i) was convicted or adjudicated delinquent of a qualifying offense and (ii) committed the qualifying offense as a direct result of being a victim of sex trafficking, as defined in the bill. As introduced, the bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission. Issuance of writ of vacatur for victims of commercial sex trafficking. Establishes a procedure for victims of sex trafficking to file a petition of vacatur in circuit court to have certain convictions vacated and the police and court records expunged for such convictions. The bill requires the court to grant the writ and vacate a qualifying offense if it finds the petitioner (i) was convicted or adjudicated delinquent of a qualifying offense and (ii) committed the qualifying offense as a direct result of being a victim of sex trafficking, as defined in the bill. As introduced, the bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Commercial sex trafficking; issuance of writ of vacatur for victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543) | |
2021-04-07 | House | Enacted, Chapter 543 (effective 7/1/21) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2021-04-07 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2133ER2) |
2021-04-07 | House | Reenrolled |
2021-04-07 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2021-04-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2133ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102882D-E |
2021-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2133E |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102882D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2133 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 327.15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 327.20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |