VA HB2127 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Best interests of a child; frequent and continuing contact with each parent. Provides that, while considering the best interests of a child for the purposes of determining custody or visitation arrangements, the court shall, when appropriate, assure frequent and continuing contact with each parent.
Title
Children; maximizing amount of time minor children spend with each parent.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 16-N) (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 16-N) (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2019-02-24 | Senate | No further action taken |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19107303D-S1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19107303D-S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 16-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (80-Y 16-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2127H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105450D-H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105450D-H1 |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104127D |