VA HB2126 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Location of wetland mitigation banks. Removes the references to an outdated map used to identify mitigation banks and instead uses the more readily identifiable hydrologic unit boundaries of the National Watershed Boundary Dataset.
Title
Wetland mitigation banks; removes references to an outdated map used to identify.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 253 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2126ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-31 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2126H1 | |
2011-01-28 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104475D-H1 | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-26 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104475D-H1 | |
2011-01-26 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101571D |
Subjects
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2 | 1308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 223.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |