VA HB2124 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2124

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0476)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Medical Assistance Services; testing for, treatment of, and vaccination against COVID-19; emergency services. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services, during a public health emergency related to COVID-19 declared by the U.S. Secretary of Health and Human Services, to deem testing for, treatment of, and vaccination against COVID-19 to be emergency services for which payment may be made pursuant to federal law for certain aliens not lawfully admitted for permanent residence. The provisions of the bill will not become effective unless the federal government no longer funds reimbursement of claims covered by the provisions of the bill. Department of Medical Assistance Services; testing for, treatment of, and vaccination against COVID-19; emergency services. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services, during a public health emergency related to COVID-19 declared by the U.S. Secretary of Health and Human Services, to deem testing for, treatment of, and vaccination against COVID-19 to be emergency services for which payment may be made pursuant to federal law for certain aliens not lawfully admitted for permanent residence. The provisions of the bill will not become effective unless the federal government no longer funds reimbursement of claims covered by the provisions of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19; DMAS shall deem testing, treatment, and vaccination to be emergency services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (12-Y 6-N) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0476)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 476 (effective - see bill)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2124ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-25HouseVOTE: Adoption (61-Y 38-N)
2021-02-25HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (61-Y 38-N)
2021-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-25SenatePassed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N)
2021-02-25SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2021-02-25SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-25SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-25SenateRead third time
2021-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-18SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-12SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
2021-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 21102611D-E
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2124E
2021-01-29HouseEmergency clause deleted
2021-01-29HouseAmendments by Delegate Lopez agreed to
2021-01-29HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (12-Y 6-N)
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2021-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-21HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 9-N)
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102611D

Same As/Similar To

HB2124 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2124
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2124+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2124E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2124ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0476+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2124AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200544A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2124AS
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/.htm
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2124ASE
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2124F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2124FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2124FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12C0060+HB2124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0205C0012+HB2124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02C0041+HB2124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1308+HB2124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0132+HB2124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0068+HB2124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0090+HB2124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0397HB2124+HB2124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0452HB2124+HB2124
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1980+HB2124

Bill Comments 750

feedback