VA HB2124 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 644 (effective 7/1/19)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Length of school term; waiver for evacuation. Requires the Board of Education to waive the requirement that school divisions provide additional teaching days or teaching hours to compensate for school closings resulting from an evacuation directed and compelled by the Governor for up to five teaching days. The bill provides that there shall be no proportionate reduction in the amount paid by the Commonwealth from the Basic School Aid Fund or the amount paid by a local governing body. This bill is identical to SB 1269.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Length of school term; waiver for evacuation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 644 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2124ER)
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19105663D-EH1
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB2124EH1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment from Appropriations agreed to
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute from Education agreed to 19105663D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105663D-H1
2019-01-28HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102025D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22198(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2124
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2124+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2124H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2124EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2124ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0902V0026+HB2124
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0058+HB2124
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0203V0019+HB2124
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0052+HB2124
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2372+HB2124
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0234+HB2124
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2124+HB2124
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0761HB2124+HB2124

Bill Comments

feedback