VA HB2106 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Harassment by computer and electronic means; penalty. Provides that any person who, with the intent to coerce, intimidate, or harass any person, (i) engages in a continuing course of conduct of communication by electronic means or using a computer or computer network to make disparaging statements about such person's physical characteristics, sexuality, sexual activity, or mental or physical health or condition; (ii) creates a fake profile of such person on any Internet website or social media platform; (iii) pretends to be another person in any Internet chat room, electronic mail message, or instant electronic message; (iv) posts a real or altered image of such person on the Internet; or (v) accesses, alters, copies, or erases any content of a computer, computer network, or password protected account on any network or social media platform is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. If any person age 18 or older commits such offense involving a child victim, the penalty upon conviction shall include a mandatory minimum term of confinement of 10 days and a mandatory minimum fine of $250. If any person age 18 or older has previously been convicted of such offense involving a child victim, a second or subsequent conviction involving a child victim shall include a mandatory minimum term of confinement of 30 days and a mandatory minimum fine of $500.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harassment by computer and electronic means; penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-21HouseReferred from Science and Technology by voice vote
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Science and Technology
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103990D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182152.7:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback