VA HB2105 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highway definitions. Makes technical amendments to conform Virginia's statutes with corresponding changes in federal nomenclature.
Title
Junkyards; policy and definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127) | |
2013-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 127 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2105ER) |
2013-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103591D |