VA HB2098 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2098
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0068)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0068)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Disposition of property previously used by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services as the Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute. Authorizes the Governor to lease a portion of property previously used by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services as the Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute to Smyth County in as-is condition for a term of three years upon such terms and conditions as may be agreed by the parties, including, without limitation, Smyth County's responsibility for building or infrastructure refurbishments and operational expenses. The bill also corrects tax map references from a 2019 conveyance of property in Smyth County.
Title
Southwestern Va. Mental Health Institute; Governor to lease a portion of property to Smyth County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0068) | |
2021-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 68 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2098ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Rereferred to General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102161D-E |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2098E |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee on Appropriations amendment agreed to |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee on HWI amendment agreed to |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (19-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102161D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2098 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
SB1429 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)
SB1429 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)
SB1429 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)
SB1429 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Governor
Property and Conveyances
Smyth County
Southwest Virginia
Uncodified Legislation
Governor
Property and Conveyances
Smyth County
Southwest Virginia
Uncodified Legislation