VA HB2097 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Board for Architects, Professional Engineers, Land Surveyors, Certified Interior Designers and Landscape Architects; required insurance for certain licensees. Provides that the Board shall, by regulation, require each architect or professional engineer to maintain an errors and omissions policy that is acceptable to the Board and to provide a certification or attestation that such policy is in effect as a prerequisite to license issuance or renewal.
Title
Architect or professional engineers; required to maintain an error and omissions policy.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102192D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2097 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2097+hil |