VA HB2095 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0231)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0231)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of Intergovernmental Affairs. Removes references to the Office of Intergovernmental Affairs and provides for the Assistant to the Governor for Intergovernmental Affairs to be responsible for all of the duties of the Office under current law. The bill also (i) removes the requirement for the appointment of the Assistant to the Governor for Intergovernmental Affairs to be confirmed by the General Assembly and clarifies that the position serves at the pleasure of the Governor and (ii) removes the responsibility of the Office of Intergovernmental Affairs to serve as the base office for state officials traveling to Washington, D.C.
Title
Intergovernmental Affairs, Office of; removes references to Office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0231) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 231 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2095ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103412D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1203 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0401)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |