VA HB2091 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Statewide Building Code; air conditioning in certain residential buildings. Designates May 1 as the date when cooling must be supplied in dwelling units, rooming units, or dormitory or guest rooms that are leased and include provision for cooling.
Title
Uniform Statewide Building Code; air conditioning in certain residential buildings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-27 | House: Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100763D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2091 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2091+hil |