VA HB2090 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Execution of emergency custody orders. Increases from four to six hours the time in which an emergency custody order must be executed after its issuance.
Title
Emergency custody orders; increases hours in which orders must be executed after its issuance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 249 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2090ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100932D |