VA HB209 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance agents; continuing education. Streamlines the continuing education process for insurance agents. The measure provides a producer a period of time during which he has the opportunity to correct errors and effect compliance with continuing education requirements. Provisions that conditioned an insurance agent's ability to submit late proof of compliance or reinstate a license upon payment of monetary penalties are eliminated. The measure also amends the requirement that two continuing education credit hours be in insurance law and regulations to require that three credit hours be in insurance ethics, which may include insurance law and regulations. The deadline for completing continuing education course, exemption, or waiver requirements is changed from December 31 to November 30, and any agent who fails to meet this deadline is given a final opportunity to complete the requirements if proof of completion is submitted by December 31. The measure eliminates (i) requirements that a status report be provided prior to the end of each biennium to each agent who has not satisfied continuing education requirements and (ii) the provision prohibiting agents whose license has been terminated for failing to comply with the continuing education requirements from applying for a new license prior to the expiration of a period of 90 calendar days from the date of license termination. The measure also shortens the time for the Insurance Continuing Education Board to grant or reject a grievance from 30 to 15 days. The measure will become effective January 1, 2013.
Title
Insurance agents; continuing education requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294) | |
2012-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 294 (effective 1/1/13) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-28 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB209ER) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-30 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB209H1 | |
2012-01-27 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104365D-H1 | |
2012-01-27 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-24 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104365D-H1 | |
2012-01-24 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #2 | |
2012-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101969D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1866 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1868.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1869 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1872 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1873 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1874 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |