VA HB2083 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State plan for medical assistance services; dental care; anesthesia. Directs the Board of Medical Assistance Services to amend the state plan for medical assistance services to provide for the payment of medical assistance for charges incurred and anesthetics provided in conjunction with dental care that is provided to a recipient (i) in a hospital or ambulatory surgical center if the recipient has a medical condition that requires hospitalization or general anesthesia for dental care or the recipient is a person with an autism spectrum disorder or a developmental disability, or is a person with a disability, or (ii) in the office of an oral or maxillofacial surgeon or a dentist who has obtained a permit for sedation and anesthesia, if the recipient is a person with an autism spectrum disorder or a developmental disability.
Title
State plan for medical assistance services; dental care, anesthesia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100647D |