VA HB2083 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Teacher performance; Strategic Compensation Grant Initiative created. Establishes the Strategic Compensation Grant Initiative and Fund, which provide that local school divisions may submit proposals to the Board of Education to receive grants that may be used as incentives to improve teacher and school performance. School divisions must include in their proposals a compensation model and designate groups or types of teachers to receive awarded funds. The bill sets forth eligibility requirements for teachers receiving funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strategic Compensation Grant Initiative and Fund; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
2013-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 228 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-02-23SenateSigned by President
2013-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-02-20SenateSigned by President
2013-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2083ER)
2013-02-20HouseEnrolled
2013-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-14SenateRead third time
2013-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-12SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2013-02-07SenateRereferred to Finance
2013-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2013-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2013-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2013-01-29HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2013-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2013-01-28HousePrinted as engrossed 13101498D-E
2013-01-28HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2083E
2013-01-28HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2013-01-28HouseRead second time
2013-01-25HouseRead first time
2013-01-23HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2013-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2013-01-21HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2013-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2013-01-21HouseReported from Education with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
2013-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
2013-01-14HouseAssigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action
2013-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2013-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101498D

Same As/Similar To

SB1185 (Same As) 2013-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221318.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221318.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2083
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2083+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2083E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2083ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+CHAP0228+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H0903V0003+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H09V0024+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H02V0036+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV0330+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H0204V0004+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S04V0149+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S05V0245+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0491HB2083+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0530HB2083+HB2083

Bill Comments 750

feedback