VA HB2082 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Redistricting Commission; transparency in redistricting process. Requires meetings and hearings of the Virginia Redistricting Commission to be livestreamed, whether held virtually or in person, and to allow for public comment. Meetings and hearings that are held in person are required to be conducted in different regions of the Commonwealth, including the Northern Virginia region, the Central Virginia region, the Hampton Roads region, the Southside region, and the Southwest region. An additional public hearing is required to be held in the event that the initial plan for districts submitted by the Commission is rejected by the General Assembly. If adjustments are made to a proposed plan at any stage in response to public comment, the adjusted proposed plan is required to be published on the Commission's website. The bill requires all meetings and hearings of the Supreme Court of Virginia regarding the establishment of districts to be open to the public. Virginia Redistricting Commission; transparency in redistricting process. Requires meetings and hearings of the Virginia Redistricting Commission to be livestreamed, whether held virtually or in person, and to allow for public comment. Meetings and hearings that are held in person are required to be conducted in different regions of the Commonwealth, including the Northern Virginia region, the Central Virginia region, the Hampton Roads region, the Southside region, and the Southwest region. An additional public hearing is required to be held in the event that the initial plan for districts submitted by the Commission is rejected by the General Assembly. If adjustments are made to a proposed plan at any stage in response to public comment, the adjusted proposed plan is required to be published on the Commission's website. The bill requires all meetings and hearings of the Supreme Court of Virginia regarding the establishment of districts to be open to the public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Redistricting Commission; transparency in redistricting process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 41-N 4-A) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 41-N 4-A)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 41-N 4-A)
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2082H1
2021-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104053D-H1
2021-02-04HouseRead second time
2021-02-03HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104053D-H1
2021-02-03HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Voting Rights
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102783D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242314(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2082
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2082+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2082H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104018D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21104053.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2082F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2082FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1806V0008+HB2082
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H18V0040+HB2082
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1501+HB2082
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S08V0063+HB2082

Bill Comments

feedback