VA HB2082 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2082
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N 2-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N 2-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Redistricting Commission; transparency in redistricting process. Requires meetings and hearings of the Virginia Redistricting Commission to be livestreamed, whether held virtually or in person, and to allow for public comment. Meetings and hearings that are held in person are required to be conducted in different regions of the Commonwealth, including the Northern Virginia region, the Central Virginia region, the Hampton Roads region, the Southside region, and the Southwest region. An additional public hearing is required to be held in the event that the initial plan for districts submitted by the Commission is rejected by the General Assembly. If adjustments are made to a proposed plan at any stage in response to public comment, the adjusted proposed plan is required to be published on the Commission's website. The bill requires all meetings and hearings of the Supreme Court of Virginia regarding the establishment of districts to be open to the public. Virginia Redistricting Commission; transparency in redistricting process. Requires meetings and hearings of the Virginia Redistricting Commission to be livestreamed, whether held virtually or in person, and to allow for public comment. Meetings and hearings that are held in person are required to be conducted in different regions of the Commonwealth, including the Northern Virginia region, the Central Virginia region, the Hampton Roads region, the Southside region, and the Southwest region. An additional public hearing is required to be held in the event that the initial plan for districts submitted by the Commission is rejected by the General Assembly. If adjustments are made to a proposed plan at any stage in response to public comment, the adjusted proposed plan is required to be published on the Commission's website. The bill requires all meetings and hearings of the Supreme Court of Virginia regarding the establishment of districts to be open to the public.
Title
Virginia Redistricting Commission; transparency in redistricting process.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] |
Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N 2-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 41-N 4-A) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 41-N 4-A) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N 2-A) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 41-N 4-A) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 41-N 4-A) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2082H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104053D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104053D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Voting Rights |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102783D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2082 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)