VA HB2068 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; eligibility of persons with disabilities and persons age 65 or older. Entitles (i) persons with disabilities who are not reasonably able to go in person to the polls on election day and (ii) persons who will be age 65 or older on the date of the election to vote absentee. Current law allows persons with disabilities who are unable to go in person to the polls on election day to vote absentee. The bill does not change current law that entitles persons age 65 or older and persons with disabilities to vote outside of the polling place upon request.
Title
Absentee voting; eligibility of persons with disabilities and persons age 65 or older.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102287D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 649 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2068 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2068+hil |