VA HB2064 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2064

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Recording an electronic document; electronic notarial certificate; emergency. Provides that if a clerk has an eRecording System, the clerk shall follow the provisions of the Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act. The bill further provides that if a clerk does not have an eRecording System, the clerk shall record a legible paper copy of an electronic document, provided that such copy otherwise meets the requirements for recordation and is certified to be a true and accurate copy of the electronic original by the party who submits the document for recordation. The bill requires an electronic notarial certificate to include the county or city in the Commonwealth where the notary public was physically located and indicate whether the notarization was done in person or by remote online notarization, defined in the bill as an electronic notarization where the signer is not in the physical presence of the notary. The bill also adds additional forms of "satisfactory evidence of identity" when a notary is using video and audio communication. The bill contains an emergency clause. Recording an electronic document; electronic notarial certificate; emergency. Provides that if a clerk has an eRecording System, the clerk shall follow the provisions of the Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act. The bill further provides that if a clerk does not have an eRecording System, the clerk shall record a legible paper copy of an electronic document, provided that such copy otherwise meets the requirements for recordation and is certified to be a true and accurate copy of the electronic original by the party who submits the document for recordation. The bill requires an electronic notarial certificate to include the county or city in the Commonwealth where the notary public was physically located and indicate whether the notarization was done in person or by remote online notarization, defined in the bill as an electronic notarization where the signer is not in the physical presence of the notary. The bill also adds additional forms of "satisfactory evidence of identity" when a notary is using video and audio communication. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recording an electronic document; electronic notarial certificate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078)
2021-03-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 78 (effective 3/11/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2064ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-17SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateRead third time
2021-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15SenateReported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2064H1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103673D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103673D-H1
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102874D

Same As/Similar To

HB2064 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171223(n/a)See Bill Text
47116(n/a)See Bill Text
4712(n/a)See Bill Text
551606(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2064
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2064+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2064H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2064ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0078+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2064F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2064FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2064FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0802C0018+HB2064
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H08C0132+HB2064
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1358+HB2064
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1420+HB2064
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03C0131+HB2064
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03V0036+HB2064
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0071HB2064+HB2064
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0080HB2064+HB2064

Bill Comments

feedback