VA HB2059 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Noncitizens of the United States; aliens; terminology. Removes the term "alien" as it pertains to persons who are not citizens or nationals of the United States and replaces it with synonymous language, as appropriate, throughout the Code of Virginia.
Title
Noncitizens of the United States; removes term aliens throughout Code.
Sponsors
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Sally Hudson [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in General Laws |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103118D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 1050.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1056.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1238.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1246.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 753 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 769 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 915 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 931 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 294.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 81.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4311.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 287 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 6500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 11.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 328.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
47 | 1 | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 220.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 220.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 2107.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 617 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |