VA HB2046 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0114)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0114)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription drug orders; information on proper disposal. Requires the Board of Pharmacy to develop guidelines for the provision of counseling and information regarding proper disposal of unused dispensed drugs, including information about pharmacy drug disposal programs in which the pharmacy may participate, by pharmacists to patients for whom a prescription is dispensed.
Title
Unused dispensed drugs; guidelines for provision of counseling and information on proper disposal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0114) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 114 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2046ER) |
2017-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2046H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104928D-H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104928D-H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103610D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Narcotics and Drugs
Pharmacies
Prescription Medicines
Professions and Occupations
Uncodified Legislation
Narcotics and Drugs
Pharmacies
Prescription Medicines
Professions and Occupations
Uncodified Legislation