VA HB2037 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0407)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0407)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Teacher licensure; criteria; assessments. Requires the Board of Education to issue a license to an individual seeking initial licensure who has not completed the professional assessments prescribed by the Board, if such individual (i) holds a provisional license that will expire within three months; (ii) is employed by a school board; (iii) is recommended for licensure by the division superintendent; (iv) has attempted, unsuccessfully, to obtain a qualifying score on the professional assessments prescribed by the Board; (v) has received an evaluation rating of proficient or above on the performance standards for each year of the provisional license, and such evaluation was conducted in a manner consistent with the Guidelines for Uniform Performance Standards and Evaluation Criteria for Teachers, Principals, and Superintendents; and (vi) meets all other requirements for initial licensure. The bill removes the requirement that the Board of Education prescribe an assessment of basic skills for individuals seeking entry into an approved education preparation program and establish a minimum passing score for such assessment. This bill is identical to SB 1397.
Title
Diversifying Teacher Workforce Act; teacher licensure, criteria, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0407) | |
2019-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 407 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2037ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19103702D-E |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2037E |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Education with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103702D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 298.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 298.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |