VA HB2036 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Veterans Services; veterans care center in Northern Virginia; report. Directs the Department of Veterans Services to study and develop a plan for the establishment of a veterans care center in the eastern portion of the Northern Virginia region and to report such plan to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committees on Appropriations and Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committees on Finance and Appropriations and Education and Health by November 1, 2023.
Title
Veterans care center; DVS to establish in the eastern portion of the Northern Va. region, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102134D |