VA HB2036 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Hunting with bow and arrow or crossbow. Allows persons who hunt with a bow and arrow or a crossbow to hunt wild birds or wild animals, including any nuisance species, on Sunday.
Title
Hunting with bow and arrow or crossbow; allows persons to hunt birds or animals on Sunday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101437D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2036 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2036+hil |