VA HB2029 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle emissions inspection program. Provides for an on-road clean screen program, allowing a motor vehicle owner to certify compliance with emissions standards by means of on-road remote sensing.
Title
Vehicle emissions inspection program; provides for an on-road clean screen program, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-27 | House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote | |
2011-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101785D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1176 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1178 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1178.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1182 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |