VA HB2027 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0244)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0244)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Underground transmission lines; pilot program. Extends the scheduled expiration of the pilot program established in 2008 for the underground placement of certain electric transmission lines from July 1, 2012, to July 1, 2014. The due date for the State Corporation Commission's final report on the pilot program is postponed until December 1, 2014.
Title
Underground transmission lines; extends scheduled expiration date of pilot program.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0244) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 244 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2027ER) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-07 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-01 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #3 Special Subcommittee on Energy | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101052D |