VA HB2026 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Motor Vehicles; regulation of property carriers. Combines the current property carrier and bulk property carrier authorities and eliminates the current license requirement for property brokers. The bill eliminates the requirement for the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue specially designated license plates for property-carrying vehicles operated for hire. The bill reduces from $750,000 to $300,000 insurance limits for carriers operating vehicles with a gross vehicle weight rating in excess of 7,500 pounds but not in excess of 10,000 pounds. For passenger cars, motorcycles, autocycles, and vehicles with a gross vehicle weight rating of 10,000 pounds or less, the bill requires liability coverage for property carriers of a minimum of (i) $25,000 per person, $50,000 per incident for death and bodily injury, and $20,000 for property damage when the motor carrier is available to transport property and (ii) $100,000 per person, $300,000 per incident for death and bodily injury, and $50,000 for property damage from the time the motor carrier accepts the request to transport property and the vehicle is en route to pick up the property until the time the property has been removed from the vehicle and delivered to its final destination. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2018. This bill is identical to SB 1364.
Title
Property and bulk property carriers; regulation, combines authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (3-Y 0-N) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 790 (effective 1/1/18) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2026ER2) |
2017-04-05 | House | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2026ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 17105428D-S1 (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2026S1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105428D-S1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105428D-S1 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2026H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105088D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105088D-H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (3-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Special Subcommittee |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102053D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 2100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2108.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2108.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2108.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2121.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2129 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2143 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2143.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2143.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2144 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2174 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2175 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2176 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 613.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |