VA HB2026 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0119)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0119)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; remote participation in a meeting by a member of a public body; personal matter. Allows a member of a public body to participate in a meeting by electronic communication means due to personal matters under certain circumstances. Currently, such remote participation is allowed only for emergency, medical condition, or distance from the meeting location of more than 60 miles. The bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council.
Title
Virginia FOIA; remote participation in meeting by member of public body.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0119) | |
2013-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 119 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2026ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #1 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102255D |